skip to content

Norris, Desmond

CPSO#: 29145

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 15 Jun 1977

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Desmond Norris Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 26 2020

Medical Records Location

Address: Sault Area Hospital 750 Great Northern Rd. Sault Ste Marie, ON P6B 0A8
Date Received: 07 Jul 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jul 2020