skip to content

Norozi, Kambiz

CPSO#: 89981

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Oct 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 21 Oct 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, German

Education:Hanover Medical School, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Western Ont
Department of Paediatrics
PO Box 5010
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8237
Fax: (519) 685-8584 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Cardiology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: K. Norozi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Norozi ( CPSO# 89981 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Children's Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
PO Box 5010
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Germany

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatric Cardiology Effective:21 Oct 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Oct 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 15 Oct 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Nov 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Feb 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 26 Feb 2015 Active
             Dr. Kambiz Norozi may practise medicine independently in paediatric cardiology.