skip to content

Noroozi, Nastaran

CPSO#: 87047

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Jan 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4040 Finch Avenue East
Suite 405
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5
Phone: 416-335-3733
Fax: 416-840-6885 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Scarborough Health Network
Birchmount Campus
3030 Birchmount Rd
Toronto ON  M1W 3W3
Canada
Phone: 416-495-2400
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Scarborough Health Network
General Campus
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
Phone: 416-431-8113
Fax: 416-431-8279
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Nastaran Noroozi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 8 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:31 Dec 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective:18 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NASTARAN NOROOZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOROOZI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2012