skip to content

Norman, Lynne Marlene

CPSO#: 65517

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: Doiron, Lynne Marlene (used until: 08 Jul 1993 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville-Trafalgar Memorial Hosp
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: 905 845 2571 Ext. 3060 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Lynne Norman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Norman ( CPSO# 65517 )

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 26 Oct 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LYNNE MARLENE NORMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NORMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993