Noone, Damien Gerard (CPSO#: 96349)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Aug 2014

Expiry Date:  24 Aug 2021

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 25 Aug 2014

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Paediatric Nephrology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7654 Ext. 204214
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 25 Aug 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 25 Sep 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Aug 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 24 Aug 2021

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status More Information
Registration Committee Effective: 04 Aug 2015 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Damien Gerard Noone may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Pediatrics  at  the University of Toronto, in which Dr. Noone holds
                        an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically  expires  seven years from
                  the  date  of  issuance  or  when Dr. Noone no longer holds the  academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration  automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee  renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating  that Dr. Noone's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional  conduct,  or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does  not  receive  an  annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about  Dr.  Noone's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on  August  25, 2014.  In accordance  with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will,  if  not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on August 24, 2021.