skip to content

Nolan, Kevin Joseph Martin

CPSO#: 27985

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 301 Monterey Drive Ottawa, ON K2H 7B1
Date Received: 25 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:25 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Oct 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 1978
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2014
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015