skip to content

Nolan, John Paul

CPSO#: 26787

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Oct 1991
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 20 May 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1630 Niagara Stone Rd
Virgil ON  L0S 1T0
Phone: (905) 468-0403
Fax: (905) 468-4805 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

33 Royal York Rd
St Catharines ON  L2N 2N7
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd. 1 High Meadow Place Unit 13 Toronto ON M9L 0A3 Patients looking to obtain copies of the medical charts should contact toll free: 1-800-775 0093 or [email protected]
Date Received: 10 Jul 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:15 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Feb 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 May 2020
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 20 May 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 12 Apr 2021 Active
 As from April 7, 2021, the following is imposed as a term, condition and limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. John Paul Nolan in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Nolan to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

Dr. Nolan has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in all jurisdictions.  


Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: April 7, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. John Paul Nolan to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 7, 2021:

Dr. Nolan has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in all jurisdictions

 

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: August 10, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:

Update: As of July 20, 2018, Dr,. Nolan has completed all elements of this SCERP.
Download Full Document (PDF)