skip to content

Niznick, Joel Marvin

CPSO#: 31199

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Jun 1978
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Dec 1983

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1355 Bank Street
Suite 502
Ottawa ON  K1H 8K7
Phone: (613) 738-1584
Fax: (613) 738-9097 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ottawa Cardiovascular
Centre Orleans
1924 - 5929 Jean D'Arc Boulevard
Ottawa ON  K1C 6V8
Canada
Phone: (613) 749-5421
Fax: (613) 830-8211
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Joel Niznick Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 18 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Niznick ( CPSO# 31199 )

Business Address:
502 - 1355 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1H 8K7

Business Address:
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 738-8400

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 05 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOEL MARVIN NIZNICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIZNICK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 1983