skip to content

Nizami, Riaz Munir

CPSO#: 22497

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Apr 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Apr 2013
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1954

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St Regis Crescent S, Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 ext. 1 Fax: 416-398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 26 Jun 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 03 Dec 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Apr 2013

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: April 1, 2013
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Riaz Munir Nizami, to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”).

I, Dr. Riaz Nizami have voluntarily resigned from the College effective April 1, 2013, and have undertaken not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician or for a licence to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction after April 1, 2013.