skip to content

Nix, Catherine Moyra

CPSO#: 97204

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 15 Mar 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 16 Mar 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2013