skip to content

Nita, Dragos Alexandru

CPSO#: 89300

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Romanian

Education:University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
NeuroCare - NN&BH
Suite 402
1110 Sheppard Ave E
Toronto ON  M2K 2W2
Phone: (416) 224-1922
Fax: (416) 224-0056 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
Centenary Site - Galaxy 12 Clinic
2867 Ellesmere Rd
Toronto ON  M1E 4C8
Canada
Phone: (416) 281-7476
Fax: (416) 281-7313
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Neurology Centre of Toronto
Suite 100
491 Eglinton Ave W
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Canada
Phone: (416) 860-7554
Fax: (416) 860-7559
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Boomerang Health
Suite 201
9401 Jane St
Vaughan ON  L6A 4H7
Canada
Phone: (905) 553-3155
Fax: (905) 553-8120
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Avramescu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 31 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Avramescu ( CPSO# 88763 )
Dr. D. Nita ( CPSO# 89300 )

Business Address:
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Business Address:
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Business Address:
1110 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 402
Toronto ON  M2K 2W2
Phone Number: (416) 224-1922

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Centenary
Galaxy 12
Toronto ON  M1E 4C8
Phone Number: (416) 281-7476

Business Address:
Boomergan Health
9401 Jane Street
Suite 211
Vaughan ON  L6A 4H7
Phone Number: (905) 553-3155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Scarborough Health Network, Centenary Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DRAGOS ALEXANDRU NITA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NITA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
AVP - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2014