skip to content

Niroopan, Gavinn Rathan

CPSO#: 98204

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Avenue
Brantford, Ontario
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 900-5575 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

270 King George Road
Brantford, Ontario
Brantford ON  N3R 5L5
Canada
Phone: 5199005575
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GAVINN RATHAN NIROOPAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIROOPAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Aug 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 31 Jul 2019
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017