skip to content

Niraula, Saroj

CPSO#: 90311

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Mandarin, Nepali

Education:Zhengzhou University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Apr 2009 to 15 Jun 2009
PEAP - CF - Medical Oncology

University Of Toronto, 16 Jun 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Medical Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Medical Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Mar 2011
CF - Medical Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Apr 2011 to 31 Mar 2012
CF - Medical Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Apr 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Medical Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Jul 2012
CF - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jul 2012