skip to content

Ninan, Ajit Thyparampil

CPSO#: 85397

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Sep 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Sep 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ross University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ministry of Children, Community and
Social Services CPRI
600 Sanatorium Road
London ON  N6H 3W7
Phone: (519) 858-2774 Ext. 2312
Fax: 5198581917 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Ninan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 18 2019

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:23 Apr 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective:27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AJIT THYPARAMPIL NINAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NINAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Jul 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2007