skip to content

Desjardins, Nina Leah

CPSO#: 70571

MEMBER STATUS
Suspended as of 30 Jun 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 29 Jun 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
380 Wellington St
Tower B
6th floor
London ON  N6A 5B5
Phone: 5199534424
Fax: 855 896 4207 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: N.L. Desjardins Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 21 2021

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:04 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Jul 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2021
Suspension of registration imposed: Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2021

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 29 Jun 2021
Summary:

On June 29, 2021, the Discipline Committee of the College heard, via videoconference, 
 an allegation of psychiatrist Dr. Desjardins’ professional misconduct. Family members 
 of Patient A contacted the College with concerns about Dr. Desjardins’ care of and 
 conduct towards the patient, including that there were messages between Dr. 
Desjardins and Patient A which focused on conspiracy theories and that Patient A was 
 recently hospitalized. Patient A’s family was further concerned that Dr. Desjardins: 
 engaged in Twitter communications with Patient A; breached boundaries with Patient A; 
 and told Patient A’s wife that Patient A wanted to be with Dr. Desjardins. Dr. Desjardins 
 knew that Patient A was using cannabis and “mushrooms” simultaneously with his 
 prescribed medications which included anti-depressants. She did not advise him 
 against this. 
 Around the same time, the chief of staff at the hospital where Dr. Desjardins practiced 
 contacted the College to express concerns about her conduct and capacity, including a 
concern that Twitter communications between Dr. Desjardins and Patient A appeared to 
have substantially contributed to the patient’s florid manic state and related 
hospitalization. Dr. Desjardins voluntarily resigned her hospital privileges.  
 The College investigated the public complaint and undertook a Registrar’s investigation 
 based on the hospital’s concerns. An assessor retained by the College to review the 
 matters concluded that Dr. Desjardins failed to meet the standard of care, showed a 
 lack of skill and judgment and exposed patients to harm and that her documentation did 
 not meet the standard of care. 
 The Discipline hearing proceeded in the presence of Dr. Desjardins and her counsel, and 
 counsel for the College. On the basis of an Agreed Statement of Facts on Liability, the 
Committee found that Dr. Desjardins committed an act of professional misconduct 
under: 

   -  paragraph 1(1)2 of Ontario Regulation 856/93 made under the Medicine Act, 
      1991, in that she failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in 
       her care of patients; and 
    -  paragraph 1(1)33 of Ontario Regulation 856/93, in that she has engaged in an act 
      or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the 
      circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
      dishonourable or unprofessional. 
 
Disposition 
 
Taking into account an Agreed Statement of Facts on Penalty, the Discipline Committee 
ordered and directed that: 

   -  Dr. Desjardins attend before the Committee to be reprimanded; 
   -  The Registrar suspend Dr. Desjardins’ certificate of registration for 12 months 
      commencing June 30, 2021 at 12:01 a.m.; 
    -  The Registrar place the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. 
       Desjardins’ certificate of registration, effective immediately: 
       
     i.  Dr. Desjardins shall comply with the College Policy “Closing a Medical 
          Practice”;  
     ii. Dr. Desjardins shall complete the Saegis course on professionalism and 
         communications (or other similar course approved by the College) within six 
         (6) months from the date of this Order, at her own expense, by receiving a 
         passing evaluation or grade, without any condition or qualification. Dr. 
         Desjardins will provide proof to the College of her completion, including proof 
         of registration and attendance and participant assessment reports, within one 
         (1) month of completing it;  
    iii. Dr. Desjardins shall provide proof of satisfactory completion of the University 
         of Toronto Medical Record-Keeping Course upon the earlier of: (a) within six 
         (6) months of the date of this Order or if not available within six (6) months, at 
         the earliest possible date that it becomes available; and (b) within thirty (30) 
         days of receipt of evidence of Dr. Desjardin’s completion of the Course from 
         the University of Toronto 
    iv.  Beginning from the date of this Order, Dr. Desjardins shall attend, at minimum, 
         one (1) meeting per month with a psychiatrist or psychologist who is 
         acceptable to the College (“Treating Therapist”), who will sign an undertaking 
         in a form acceptable to the College. The meetings will continue for as long as 
         the Treating Therapist deems necessary, but in any event not less than two (2) 
         years and subject to College approval before discontinuing such treatment. 
         For a period of two (2) years, or such longer period as may be required by the 
         terms of this Order, Dr. Desjardins’ Treating Therapist will provide quarterly 
         reports to the College as set out in the Treating Therapist’s undertaking to the 
         College; 
     v.  Dr. Desjardins shall consent to the disclosure by her Treating Therapist to the 
         College, and by the College to her Treating Therapist, of all information the 
         Treating Therapist or the College deems necessary or desirable in order to 
         fulfill the Treating Therapist’s undertaking and Dr. Desjardin’s compliance with 
         this Order. 
Clinical Supervision  
    vi.  Prior to resuming practice following the suspension of her certificate of 
         registration described above in paragraph 3, Dr. Desjardins shall retain, at her 
         own expense, a College-approved clinical supervisor, who will sign an 
         undertaking in the form attached to the order as Schedule “A” (the “Clinical 
          Supervisor”); 
    vii. For a period of twelve (12) months commencing on the date Dr. Desjardins 
         resumes practice following the suspension of her certificate of registration 
         described above in paragraph 3, Dr. Desjardins may practice only on terms of 
         the Clinical Supervision set out herein and in Schedule “A”; 
    viii. Clinical Supervision of Dr. Desjardins practice shall contain the following 
          elements: 
            o  An initial meeting with Dr. Desjardins to discuss the objectives for the 
               Clinical Supervision and practice improvement recommendations; 
            o  The Clinical Supervisor will meet with Dr. Desjardins once every month 
               after the initial meeting. Meetings will take place at Dr. Desjardins’ 
               practice location, or another location approved by the College; 
             o The Clinical Supervisor will review at least fifteen (15) of Dr. 
               Desjardins’ patient charts at every meeting, selected at the sole 
               discretion of the Clinical Supervisor;  
             o The Clinical Supervisor will keep a log of all patient charts reviewed 
               along with patient identifiers;  
             o The Clinical Supervisor will discuss with Dr. Desjardins any concerns 
               arising from chart reviews; 
            o  The Clinical Supervisor will observe at minimum one (1) group or 
               individual therapy session at every meeting, to be selected at the sole 
               discretion of the Clinical Supervisor, ensuring that both group and 
               individual therapy sessions are observed over the course of the Clinical 
               Supervision; 
            o  The Clinical Supervisor will make recommendations to Dr. Desjardins 
               for practice improvements and ongoing professional development and 
               inquire into Dr. Desjardins’ compliance with his/her recommendations;  
            o  The Clinical Supervisor will perform any other duties, such as reviewing 
               other documents or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that 
               the Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to Dr. Desjardins’ clinical 
               supervision;  
            o  The Clinical Supervisor will provide a report to the College, at a 
               minimum of once every (3) months, or more frequently if the Clinical 
               Supervisor has concerns about Dr. Desjardins’ standard of practice or 
               conduct. Such reports shall be in reasonable detail and shall contain all 
               information the Clinical Supervisor believes might assist the College in 
               evaluating Dr. Desjardins’ standard of practice and conduct, as well as 
               Dr. Desjardins participation in and compliance with the requirements 
               set out in the Order of the Discipline Committee.  
    ix.  Dr. Desjardins shall abide by the recommendations of the Clinical Supervisor; 
     x.  If a Clinical Supervisor who has given an undertaking as set out in Schedule 
          “A” to the Order is unable or unwilling to continue to fulfill its terms, Dr. 
          Desjardins shall, within twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an 
          executed undertaking in the same form from a person who is acceptable to the 
          College and ensure that it is delivered to the College within that time;  
    xi.  If Dr. Desjardins is unable to obtain a Clinical Supervisor in accordance with 
         this Order, she shall cease to practice until such time as she has done so;  
    xii. Dr. Desjardins shall consent to the disclosure by her Clinical Supervisor to the 
         College, and by the College to her Clinical Supervisor, of all information the 
         Clinical Supervisor or the College deems necessary or desirable in order to 
         fulfill the Clinical Supervisor’s undertaking and Dr. Desjardin’s compliance with 
         this Order; and 
    xiii. Dr. Desjardins shall inform the College of each and every location where she 
         practices including but not limited to hospitals, clinics and offices, in any 
         jurisdiction (collectively her “Practice Location(s)”), within fifteen (15) days of 
         the date she resumes practice following the suspension of her certificate of 
         registration described above in paragraph 3, and shall inform the College of 
         any new Practice Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at 
         that location, for the purposes of monitoring her compliance with this Order. 
Re-Assessment 
   xiv.  Approximately six (6) months after the completion of the period of clinical 
         supervision as set out as above, Dr. Desjardins shall, at her own expense, 
         undergo a re-assessment by a College-appointed assessor (the 
         “Assessor(s)”). The re-assessment may include chart reviews and direct 
        observation of individual and group therapy sessions, interview with Dr. 
        Desjardins, her colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients and any 
        other tools deemed necessary by the College. The Assessor(s) shall submit a 
        written report on the results of the re-assessment to the College; and 
   xv.  Dr. Desjardins shall cooperate fully with the re-assessment and with the 
        Assessor(s). Dr. Desjardins shall consent to the disclosure to the Assessor(s) 
        of the reports of the Clinical Supervisor arising from the supervision and shall 
        consent to the sharing of all information between the Clinical Supervisor, the 
        Assessor(s) and the College, as the College deems necessary or desirable. 
         
   -  Dr. Desjardins pay costs to the College of $6,000. 
 
The Committee released its reasons for decision on July 16, 2021 and they are available 
for review on the College’s website.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): June 29, 2021

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: March 1, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On March 15, 2019, St. Thomas Elgin General Hospital notified the College, pursuant to s. 33(c) of the Public Hospitals Act and s. 85.5(2) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that Dr. Nina Desjardins voluntarily resigned her privileges at St. Thomas Elgin General Hospital effective March 1, 2019.