skip to content

Nimjee, Tasleem Mohamed

CPSO#: 86673

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Oct 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Oct 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Names: Murji-Nimjee, Tasleem Mohamed (used until: 14 Jan 2009 )     Nimjee, Tasleem Mohamed (used until: 03 Feb 2008 )     Murji, Tasleem Mohamed (used until: 28 Jan 2008 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Kachchi

Education:University Of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
Emergency Department
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Nimjee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:08 Oct 2009 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:29 Oct 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TASLEEM MOHAMED NIMJEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIMJEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Mar 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 31 Mar 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Oct 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 2009