skip to content

Nikore, Vinay Kumar

CPSO#: 22798

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Jun 1970
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1970
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:All-India Institute of Medical Sciences, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
353 St Paul Avenue
Brantford ON  N3R 4N3
Phone: (519) 759-5971
Fax: (519) 759-5971 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Veena Nikore Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 14 2019
Corporation Name: Vineet Nikore Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 17 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Nikore ( CPSO# 84114 )
Dr. V. Nikore ( CPSO# 22798 )

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
484 West Street
Brantford ON  N3R 3W7


Corporation Name: Veena Nikore Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 09 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Nikore ( CPSO# 22798 )
Dr. V. Nikore ( CPSO# 55015 )

Business Address:
484 West Street
Brantford ON  N3R 3W7
Phone Number: (519) 751-3604

Hospital Privileges Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

No Privileges reported.


Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  December 14, 2011
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On June 26, 2012, Brant Community Healthcare System notified the College that Dr. Vinay Kumar Nikore's privileges were temporarily suspended, effective December 14, 2011.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 02 Dec 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. VINAY KUMAR NIKORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIKORE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1970