skip to content

Nikonova, Anna S

CPSO#: 95438

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 28 Sep 2021
EXPIRY DATE
28 Sep 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Nikonova, Anna (used until: 29 Jun 2011 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Russian

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Nikonova Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 05 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Nikonova ( CPSO# 95438 )

Business Address:
51 Donisi Ave
THornhill ON  L4J G6
Phone Number: 5143498053

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
038-2 Donnely Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5632

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective:04 Nov 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 17 Nov 2014 to 12 Dec 2014
EL - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Jul 2017
CF - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2015
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 28 Sep 2021