Nikolsky, Victor (CPSO#: 97024)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Sep 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ross University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Albany Medical Clinic
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 2P8
Phone: (416) 461-9471
Fax: (416) 461-2710
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Metro East Detention Centre
55 Civic dr
Scarborough ON  M1L2K9
Canada
Phone: 4167503513 Ext. 217
Fax: 4167509852
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

240 Duncan Mill Road
North York ON  M3B 3S6
Canada
Phone: 4168405991
Fax: 6477294766
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

201-240 Duncan Mill Road
North York ON  M3B 3S6
Canada
Phone: (416) 840-5991
Fax: (647) 729-4766
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Victor Nikolsky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 24 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Nikolsky ( CPSO# 97024 )

Business Address:
Albany Medical Clinic
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 2P8
Phone Number: (416) 461-9471

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Georgia
USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 02 Sep 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VICTOR NIKOLSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIKOLSKY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Nov 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 08 Nov 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2012