skip to content

Tzemos, Nikolaos

CPSO#: 83573

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Mar 2021
EXPIRY DATE
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Feb 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Greek, Italian

Education:University of Milan, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Hospital
Division of Cardiology
339 Windermere Rd
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3038
Fax: (519) 434-3278 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

MyHealth Centre, Arva
21589 Richmond St
Arva ON  N0M 1C0
Phone: 1 888 313 0904
Fax: 519 850 0144
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

MyHealth Centre, London
Suite 301
1055 Fanshawe Park Rd W
London ON  N6G 5B4
Phone: 1 888 376 8112
Fax: 519 266 2206
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Tzemos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Dias ( CPSO# 65451 )
Dr. N. Tzemos ( CPSO# 83573 )

Business Address:
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3038

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  April 15, 2021
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On April 15, 2021, London Health Sciences Centre notified the College, pursuant to s.33(b) of the Public Hospitals Act and s.85.5(2) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that privileges for Dr. Nikolaos Tzemos at both London Health Sciences Centre and St. Joseph’s Health Care London were suspended April 14, 2021. This action was taken by London Health Sciences Centre in response to a posting on the College’s website that professional misconduct allegations against Dr. Tzemos involving sexual abuse of a patient have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College.

In letters dated April 20, 2021, London Health Sciences Centre and St. Joseph’s Health Care London advised the College that Dr. Tzemos’ privileges have been reinstated, and that, as a voluntary restriction, Dr. Tzemos requires a chaperone for in-person patient encounters at those institutions

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective:01 Feb 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2005 to 14 Oct 2005
PEAP - CF - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 15 Oct 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2017
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 09 Mar 2021

Pending Hearings

Summary:

Allegations of Dr. Tzemos’ professional misconduct have been referred to what is now called the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal. It is alleged that Dr. Tzemos engaged in sexual abuse of and/or disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct towards a patient, including by: failing to maintain appropriate boundaries with the patient, including giving the patient his phone number and/or inviting her to call him and go out with him; engaging in touching and/or behaviour of a sexual and/or inappropriate nature, including kissing the patient during a medical appointment; and making remarks of a sexual and/or inappropriate nature towards the patient.


Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): Motion Dates: November 15 & 18, 2021 Hearing Dates: January 10 - 14 & 18, 2022

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2021 Active
 1.    Dr. Nikolaos Tzemos may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division  of   Cardiology,  the  University  of Western Ontario, in
                        which Dr. Tzemos holds an academic appointment  at the rank of Full
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when  Dr. Tzemos no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.