skip to content

Niglas, Mark Richard

CPSO#: 98314

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Mar 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Estonian, French

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
RS McLaughlin Durham Reg Cancer Ctr
Department of Radiation Oncology
Room 2C101
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 5441
Fax: (905) 721-6101 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Mark Niglas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 07 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Niglas ( CPSO# 98314 )

Business Address:
Lakeriddge Health Corp Oshawa
Durham Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARK RICHARD NIGLAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIGLAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2018