skip to content

Niedoba, Joseph Edward

CPSO#: 30079

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Jun 1978
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1978

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Husky Injection Molding Systems
500 Queen Street South
Bolton ON  L7E 5S5
Phone: (905) 951-5000 Ext. 2258 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Joseph Niedoba Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 08 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Niedoba ( CPSO# 30079 )

Business Address:
Malton Village
7075 Rexwood Road
Mississauga ON  L4T 4H1
Phone Number: (905) 791-1179

Business Address:
Husky Injection Molding Systems
500 Queen Street South
Bolton ON  L7E 5S5
Phone Number: (905) 951-5000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOSEPH EDWARD NIEDOBA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIEDOBA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1978

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: September 15, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)