Nie, Chuanyi (CPSO#: 101207)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Japanese, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Northumberland Hills Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
1000 De Palma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone: (905) 372-6811
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lakeridge Bowmanville Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
47 Liberty St South
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Canada
Phone: (905) 623-3331
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Lakeridge Oshawa Hospital
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa
Oshawa ON  L1G2B9
Canada
Phone: (905) 576-8711
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chuanyi Nie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 20 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Nie ( CPSO# 101207)

Business Address:
Lakeridge Bowmanville
Department of Emergency Medicine
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Phone Number: (905) 623-3331

Business Address:
1000 DePalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone Number: (905) 372-6811

Business Address:
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 3B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHUANYI NIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2015