skip to content

Nicholson, Marcia Ann

CPSO#: 88864

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Jan 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Jan 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pharmalinx Medical Centre
178 Main St Unionville
Unionville ON  L3R 2G9
Phone: (905) 475-9100
Fax: (905) 475 9102 Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARCIA ANN NICHOLSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NICHOLSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Jan 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2011