skip to content

Nicholson, Cherie Lynn

CPSO#: 101321

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2840 2nd Ave SE
2840 2
Calgary AB  T2A 7X9
Phone: (403) 397-1700

Additional Practice Location(s)

Weeneebayko General Hospital
19 Hospital Drive
Moose Factory ON  P0L1W0
Canada
Phone: 403-397-1700
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Cherie Nicholson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 7 2019

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority,Moose Factory Site Moose Factory

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHERIE LYNN NICHOLSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NICHOLSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2017