skip to content

Nichols, Erwin Bernard

CPSO#: 16736

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Nov 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Nov 2018
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 200 - 4473 Innes Rd Orleans ON K4A 3J7
Date Received: 12 Sep 2018


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1958
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Nov 2018

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: QA Committee
Active Date: May 30, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On May 30, 2018, the Quality Assurance Committee (“QAC”) required general family medicine physician, Dr. Erwin Nichols, to complete a specified continuing education and remediation program (“SCERP”). The SCERP requires Dr. Nichols to:

• Attend and provide proof of successful completion of the following course:
o University of Toronto Medical Records course

• Practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 9 months;

• Review the following policies, guidelines or tools with reference to how each is applicable to family medicine:
o 2017 Canadian Guideline for Safe and Effective Use of Opioids for Chronic Non-Cancer Pain.
o CPSO Prescribing Drugs Policy
o CPSO Medical Records Policy
o Review of the Centre for Effective Practice Management of Chronic Non-Cancer Pain Tool
o Prescribing and Tapering Benzodiazepines
o Screening for Cervical, Breast and Colon cancer as obtained in Cancer Care Ontario’s Screen for Life
o CMAJ recommendations on screening for prostate cancer with the PSA test
o Choosing Wisely – Family Medicine

• Undergo a reassessment with an assessor selected by the College, approximately 3 months following the completion of the Education Plan.