skip to content

Nicholas, Cynthia Susan

CPSO#: 33543

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Jul 1982
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
201-15017 Yonge Street
Aurora ON  L4G 1M5
Phone: (905) 727-9447
Fax: (905) 727-7938 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Cynthia Nicholas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Nicholas ( CPSO# 33543 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
15017 Yonge Street
Aurora ON  L4G 1M5
Phone Number: (905) 727-9447

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 26 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CYNTHIA SUSAN NICHOLAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NICHOLAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1982