skip to content

Nica-Graham, Elena Irina

CPSO#: 96122

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Nica, Elena Irina (used until: 28 Jul 2014 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
60 Murray St.
Suite L1-012
Mailbox # 38
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 5883
Fax: (416) 586-3231 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Psychiatry Effective:26 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ELENA IRINA NICA-GRAHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NICA-GRAHAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Geriatric Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016