skip to content

Nica, Andra Iulia

CPSO#: 100681

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDRA IULIA NICA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NICA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 29 Sep 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 30 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2018