skip to content

Nguyen-Giang, Quynh-Lang

CPSO#: 89948

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Jul 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 10 Nov 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:University of Glasgow, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:08 Nov 2010 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 2008 to 12 Jan 2009
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 13 Jan 2009 to 20 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 2009 to 20 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 2010 to 25 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jul 2019