skip to content

Nguyen, Tri Hoang

CPSO#: 98108

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Providence Healthcare
3276 St. Clair Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1L 1W1
Phone: 416-285-3619
Fax: 416-285-3764 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
Bickle Centre
130 Dunn Avenue
Toronto ON  M6K 2R7
Canada
Phone: 416-597-3422
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

West Park Healthcare Centre
Dept. Physical Medicine & Rehab
82 Buttonwood Avenue
Toronto ON  M6M 2J5
Canada
Phone: (416) 243-3680
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Providence Health Care,Toronto Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
West Park Healthcare Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TRI HOANG NGUYEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NGUYEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017