skip to content

Nguyen, Nhu Tram Agnes

CPSO#: 95440

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 May 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Cancer Centre
3rd Floor- 699 Concession St
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone: 9053879495 Ext. 63123
Fax: 905-575-6326 Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective:05 Apr 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NHU TRAM AGNES NGUYEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NGUYEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 May 2017