skip to content

Nguyen, Geoffrey Christopher

CPSO#: 87454

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Apr 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Apr 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The Johns Hopkins University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 437
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 2819
Fax: (416) 586-5971 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ste. 601
340 College St
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Canada
Phone: (416) 928-9511
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

700 Lawrence Ave W
Toronto Immune and Digestive Health
North York ON  M6A 3B4
Canada
Phone: 6478122113
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Drs. Rachel Chong & Geoffrey Nguyen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 20 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Chong ( CPSO# 87099 )
Dr. G. Nguyen ( CPSO# 87454 )

Business Address:
Ste. 601
340 College St
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 928-9511

Business Address:
47 Liberty St
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Phone Number: (905) 623-3331

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 437
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
Oshawa Clinic
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone Number: (905) 721-4975

Business Address:
300 Gordon Street
Whitby ON  L1N 5T2
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:01 May 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective:20 Oct 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GEOFFREY CHRISTOPHER NGUYEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NGUYEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 15 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Apr 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2008