skip to content

Ngo, Quang

CPSO#: 84967

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 May 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
Faculty of Health Sciences
1280 Main Street West, HSC 3A
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75155 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Lee, Ngo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 27 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. Q. Ngo ( CPSO# 84967 )
Dr. A. Lee ( CPSO# 84584 )

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
118 - 1060 Speers Road
Oakville ON  L6L 2X4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Emergency Medicine Effective: 24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. QUANG NGO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NGO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 May 2011