skip to content

Ng, Wendy Kar Yee

CPSO#: 90525

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
396 S. Main St., Suite 200
ORANGE CA  92868
United States
Phone: 7149886330

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Arizona
USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. WENDY KAR YEE NG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015