skip to content

Ng, Victor Kar Ho

CPSO#: 91377

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, French

Education:Max Rady College of Medicine, University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Emergency Medicine
Rough Valley Centenary
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 284-8131 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON  N6A 5W9
Canada
Phone: 5196858500
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Victor Kar Ho Ng Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 18 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Ng ( CPSO# 91377 )

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
Department of Emergency Medicine
Rough Valley Centenary
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
Scarborough Health Network, Centenary Hospital Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:27 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:19 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. VICTOR KAR HO NG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2011