skip to content

Ng Thow Hing, Roland

CPSO#: 26452

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 May 1974
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 16 Sep 2019
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, Creole, English, French

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
240 Mackay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1C5
Phone: (613) 732-2611
Fax: (613) 732-8914 Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 May 1974
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 16 Sep 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 16 Sep 2019 Active
             As from September 16, 2019, the following terms, conditions and limitations are
            imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Roland Ng Thow Hing, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent Dr. Ng Thow Hing has given to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                            ("Undertaking")

                                                  of

                                        DR. ROLAND NG THOW HING
                                             ("Dr. Hing")

                                                  to

                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")
                                                                                     
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Hing, certificate of registration number 26452, am a member of the
                  College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Hing, acknowledge that following a public complaint that raised
                  concerns about my standard of practice in emergency medicine, I underwent
                  remediation and submitted to a reassessment of my practice. The
                  reassessment report subsequently received by the College raised concerns
                  about my standard of practice in emergency medicine.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Hing, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately. 

            (5)   Practice Restrictions

            (a)   I, Dr. Hing, undertake that I will not engage in any of the following
                  areas of practice:

                  (i)   Emergency medicine.
                  
            (6)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Hing, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location where I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent
                        Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"),
                        within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward,
                        I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new
                        Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at
                        that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Hing, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
                        charts by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Hing, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
            (d)   I, Dr. Hing, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                  attached hereto as Appendix "A".

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (7)   I, Dr. Hing, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (8)   I, Dr. Hing, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible
                  for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (9)   I, Dr. Hing, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (10)  I, Dr. Hing, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

            (11)  I, Dr. Hing, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (12)  I, Dr. Hing, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (13)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Hing, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Hing, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (13)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              A reassessment report received by the College raised concerns
                              about Dr. Hing's standard of practice in emergency medicine.
                              As a result of the reassessment, Dr. Hing must not practise
                              any of the following: emergency medicine.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (14)  I, Dr. Hing, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: September 16, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Roland Ng Thow Hing to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 16, 2019:

A reassessment report received by the College raised concerns about Dr. Hing’s standard of practice in emergency medicine. As a result of the reassessment, Dr. Hing must not practise any of the following: emergency medicine.


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: October 15, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP: [link to pdf]
Download Full Document (PDF)