skip to content

Ng, Terry L

CPSO#: 95715

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 May 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 May 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
Division of Medical Oncology
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: 613-737-7700 Ext. 70170 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Terry L. Ng Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Ng ( CPSO# 95715 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
Division of Medical Oncology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-7700

Medical Records Location

Address: Ottawa Hospital 501 Smyth Road Ottawa, ON K1H 8L6
Date Received: 09 Aug 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective:27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TERRY L NG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
AVP - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 May 2018