skip to content

Ng, Sarah

CPSO#: 96925

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 24 Jan 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Dublin Trinity College, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:10 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Nov 2011 to 23 Jan 2012
AVP - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Jan 2012 to 31 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2013