skip to content

Ng, Matthew

CPSO#: 92911

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Feb 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Feb 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Etobicoke Medical Centre
Suite 400
85 East Mall
Etobicoke ON  M8Z 5W4
Phone: (416) 621-2220 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Matthew Ng Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 21 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ng ( CPSO# 92911 )

Business Address:
Etobicoke Medical Centre
85 East Mall
Etobicoke ON  M8Z 5W4
Phone Number: (416) 621-2220

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:11 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MATTHEW NG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Feb 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 2013