skip to content

Ng, Marcus Cho-Yin

CPSO#: 92636

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 06 Feb 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 10 Jan 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 12 Apr 2010 to 09 May 2010
EL - Neurology

University of Toronto, 10 Jan 2011 to 06 Feb 2011
EL - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 May 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Feb 2011