skip to content

Ng Cheng Hin, Raymond Louis Tsien Kwee

CPSO#: 22387

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Sep 1969

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, French

Education:University of Aberdeen School of Medicin, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd. Tel: 1-800-775-0093
Date Received: 07 Dec 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:01 Jan 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1969
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2020