skip to content

Newman, Peter Robin

CPSO#: 28790

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Jul 2021
EXPIRY DATE
21 Jul 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Sep 1976

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hebrew, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS Record Storage, 111 Saint Regis Crescent S, North York ON M3J 1Y6
Instructions: Medical records up to and including August 2012
Date Received: 15 Dec 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1977 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jul 2021