Neumann, Peter Zsigmond (CPSO#: 17394)

Current Status: Expired: Member deceased as of 09 Dec 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Dec 2018

Summary

Date of Death: 9-Dec-2018

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:Medical University of Szeged, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1964 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 1960
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 May 1965
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 1977
Expired: Member deceased. Expiry date: 09 Dec 2018