skip to content

Neufeld, Troy Mitchell

CPSO#: 92956

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Perth and Smiths Falls Hospital
33 Drummond Street West
Perth ON  K7H2K1
Phone: (613) 267-1500 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L2V7
Canada
Phone: (613) 548-3232
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Troy Neufeld Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 31 2014
Corporation Name: Dr. Troy Neufeld Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 27 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Neufeld ( CPSO# 92956 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-3232

Business Address:
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
33 Drummond Street West
Perth ON  K7H 2K1
Phone Number: (613) 267-1500

Business Address:
Health Force Ontario-EDLP
Toronto ON  M5A 1S1
Phone Number: (416) 862-4788

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Haliburton Highlands Health Services,Haliburton Site Haliburton
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Great War Memorial Site-Perth Perth
Quinte Healthcare North Hastings,Bancroft Bancroft
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:15 Oct 2019 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TROY MITCHELL NEUFELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEUFELD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2012