Neuendorff-el Helou, Luise (CPSO#: 99339)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Nov 2012

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 27 Nov 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ruprecht Karl Univ of Heidelberg, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: 905-525-9140 Ext. ext 22116
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. el Helou Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 24 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Neuendorff-el Helou ( CPSO# 99339 )
Dr. S. el Helou ( CPSO# 92597 )

Business Address:
McMaster University Children's Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
Neonatology Room 4F
1280 Main Street Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LUISE NEUENDORFF-EL HELOU shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. NEUENDORFF-EL HELOU is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. NEUENDORFF-EL HELOU shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. NEUENDORFF-EL HELOU is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. NEUENDORFF-EL HELOU shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. NEUENDORFF-EL HELOU is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. NEUENDORFF-EL HELOU no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2012 to 23 Nov 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 24 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 08 Apr 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 09 Apr 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 10 Apr 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 11 Apr 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Nov 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019