skip to content

Nethirasigamani, Dinesh

CPSO#: 85925

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Aug 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Aug 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Tamil Nadu Dr M G R Medical University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Nethirasigamani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 30 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Nethirasigamani ( CPSO# 85925 )

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:18 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DINESH NETHIRASIGAMANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NETHIRASIGAMANI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Feb 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2010