skip to content

Netherton, Fredrick Lloyd

CPSO#: 23410

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. F.L. Netherton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 7 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: Erie Shores Healthcare 194 Talbot St W Leamington ON N8H 1N9
Date Received: 09 May 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 05 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019