skip to content

Nethercott, James Ronson

CPSO#: 22750

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Sep 1993
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 01 Jan 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Sep 1993
The CPSO will be closed on Friday, April 19, 2019 for the statutory holiday. We will reopen at 8 a.m. on Monday, April 22.