skip to content

Nessim, Carolyn

CPSO#: 94038

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
CCW 1617d, Box 202
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 71085
Fax: (613) 737-8659 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Ottawa Hospital, Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
Phone: 613-737-8899 Ext. 71085
Fax: 613-737-8659
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside Dr.
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Canada
Phone: 613-737-8899 Ext. 71085
Fax: 613-737-8659
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Carolyn Nessim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 24 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Nessim ( CPSO# 94038 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
Suite 7462 Box 202
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CAROLYN NESSIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NESSIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Surgical Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 7 - Surgical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010